Accounts and annual returns LAMMERMUIR LIMITED

Charity number: 1085406
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 14 April 2025 349 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 27 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 June 2021 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 June 2021 56 days late