ANGLICAN RELIGIOUS COMMUNITIES IN ENGLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARC is an umbrella body for members of religious communities in the Church of England. We hold a conference once every 2 years in person and the other year online , circulate a newsletter twice a year to all members, maintain a digital Year Book online and answer enquiries from the general public. We assist with promoting the life of Religious in the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 May 2003: Standard registration
- ARC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SR SUE CSF | Chair | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Br Patrick Souter CR | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sr Linda OHP OHP | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
SISTER CLARE LOUISE MARRIOTT | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Sr Heather Mary Francis Crane OHP | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Br Hugh SSF | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sr Alison Jacquelyn Fry OSB | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sr Chris James CSF | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.37k | £10.45k | £10.52k | £10.86k | £11.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.63k | £6.47k | £12.28k | £6.01k | £8.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/09/2001 AS AMENDED ON 24/10/2002 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2003 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 09 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SUPPORTING THE RELIGIOUS COMMUNITIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
92 Blackgate Lane
Tarleton
Preston
PR4 6UT
- Phone:
- 07968753978
- Email:
- info@arcie.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window