THROUGH THE ROOF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THROUGH THE ROOF GIVES ADVICE AND PRODUCES WRITTEN RESOURCES, AS WELL AS TRAINING, TO EQUIP CHURCHES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO BE INCLUSIVE OF DISABLED PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES. WE DO THIS THROUGHOUT THE UK AND IN AFRICA. WE DONATE MOBILITY AIDS TO THOSE IN NEED IN AFRICA. OUR VISION IS TO MAKE THE GOOD NEWS OF THE CHRISTIAN MESSAGE ACCESSIBLE TO ALL.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
101 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
- India
- Kenya
- Mozambique
- Nigeria
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 31 July 2001: Standard registration
- 14 December 2019: Funds received from 1063112 CARERS CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
- CHURCHES FOR ALL (Working name)
- DISABLED CHRISTIANS FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- THROUGH THE ROOF (Working name)
- WHEELS FOR THE WORLD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Semper | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Dalton | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rev TREVOR MICHAEL HAHN | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|||||
CAROL ALICE ARNOLD | Trustee | 11 September 2012 |
|
|||||
CLYDE CLIFFORD BACCHUS | Trustee | 11 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MACCABE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £382.51k | £312.84k | £317.17k | £431.29k | £261.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £335.58k | £296.81k | £228.34k | £278.48k | £332.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.81k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 18TH APRIL 2001 AND VARIED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED ON 23RD JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE CHRISTIAN FAITH PARTICULARLY AMONGST PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL AND OTHER DISABILITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREI00N CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY. (B) TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST PERSONS WITH PHYSICAL AND OTHER DISABILITIES AND IN DOING SO TO PROMOTE THE INTEGRATION AND PARTICIPATION OF SUCH PERSONS IN CHURCH LIFE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND TO PROMOTE AN AWARENESS OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS AND APPROPRIATE RESPONSES TO THOSE NEEDS AMONGST CHURCHES AND CHRISTIANS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AND TO TRAIN CHRISTIANS IN WAYS OF SERVING AND HELPING PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDON AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Alpha House
Alpha Place
Garth Road
Morden
SM4 4TQ
- Phone:
- 01372749955
- Email:
- info@throughtheroof.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window