THE FRIENDS OF CHRIST CHURCH SWINDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the work of Christ Church with St. Mary's, Swindon by financing the maintenance of the church, its associated buildings and the churchyard in the immediate vicinity of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Swindon
Governance
- 05 October 2001: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF CHRIST CHURCH SWIND (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF CHRIST CHURCH SWINDON SKYLINE APPEAL (Working name)
- THE SKYLINE APPEAL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Andrew Smith | Chair | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Wright | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Simon Giles | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Eggers | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||
CHRISTINE MARY SENIOR | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Pitt | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Austin | Trustee | 22 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Janet French Miss | Trustee | 24 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Juliya Kablak | Trustee | 01 May 2004 |
|
|
||||
Rev SIMON STEVENETTE | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLINE MARGARET PITT MA, MSc | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £3.86k | £2.28k | £3.32k | £7.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.53k | £3.92k | £3.08k | £2.36k | £2.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED 23 SEPTEMBER 2001
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST. MARY'S IN OLD TOWN, SWINDON, WILTSHIRE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST. MARY'S IN OLD TOWN, SWINDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O PARISH OFFICE
Community Centre at Christ Church
Cricklade Street
SWINDON
SN1 3HB
- Phone:
- 07999803730
- Email:
- sec.focc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window