Financial history THE J AND D HAMBRO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1088252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £48.07k £5.17k £20.48k £46.37k £54.24k
Total expenditure £49.82k £6.85k £22.14k £48.38k £62.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A