PAKISTAN SOCIETY OF HARROW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Social and Cultural activities and welfare of the Community particularly youth and elderly.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Harrow
Governance
- 07 January 2003: Standard registration
- PAKISTAN SOCIETY HARROW (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ghazanfar Ali B.Com FMAT | Trustee | 01 March 2005 |
|
|||||
SHAKIRA KUNWAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ASAD ALI RUSHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHAHANA SADIQ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAZAL RAHMAN CHAUDHARY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR SHAKER SHAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED AMIN MAAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR IMTIAZ SHAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NAJAM AFTAB SHEIKH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.04k | £85 | £85 | £215 | £115 | |
|
Total expenditure | £982 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 303 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 April 2021 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 JULY 2001 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE PAKISTAN SOCIETY OF HARROW ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF IN PARTICULAR OF RESIDENTS WHO ARE OF PAKISTANI DESCENT (THE BENEFICIARIES) IN THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF HARROW, BRENT, BARNET AND HILLINGDON ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"). (A) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE. (B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES, IN PARTICULAR IN THE ARTS, CUSTOMS, HISTORY AND LANGUAGES OF PAKISTAN.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON - HARROW - BRENT - BARNET - HILLINGDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Hawthorn Drive
HARROW
HA2 7NX
- Phone:
- 02088660010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window