Accounts and annual returns HUMAN CARE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1095842
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 21 May 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 21 May 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 21 May 2010 12 December 2011 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 21 May 2010 08 December 2011 262 days late
Annual return 30 August 2009 21 July 2010 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2009 19 May 2010 On Time
Annual return 30 August 2008 04 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2008 05 May 2009 On Time