THE BRITISH PORPHYRIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for people with porphryia and their relatives. Improve understanding of porphryia. Support research into porphryia.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 November 2001: Standard registration
- 17 February 2017: Funds received from 328647 THE PORPHYRIA CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Victoria Anne McGuire | Chair | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jarvis | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Harrold | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natassja Chadwick | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bennett | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE NEWTON | Trustee | 30 November 2001 |
|
|
||||
KAREN ELIZABETH HARRIS | Trustee | 30 November 2001 |
|
|||||
JOHN WALTER CHAMBERLAYNE MA | Trustee |
|
||||||
ALAN MOLYNEUX | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.97k | £25.65k | £23.06k | £43.55k | £38.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.89k | £22.60k | £23.11k | £48.13k | £44.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 24 JUNE, 2001. as amended on 30 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF PERSONS AFFECTED BY PORPHYRIA AND ANY RELATED CONDITION AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN PARTICULAR BY BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO: (A)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE MEDICAL PROFESSION AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC INTO PORPHYRIA AND ITS IMPLICATIONS FOR THE FAMILY; (B)THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, EFFECTS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF PORPHYRIA AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
136 DEVONSHIRE ROAD
DURHAM
DH1 2BL
- Phone:
- 0300 30 200 30
- Email:
- helpline@porphyria.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window