Financial history THE IONE VASSILIOU CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1089246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £43.62k £30.00k £26.22k £36.91k £51.42k
Total expenditure £20.21k £78.66k £21.78k £55.69k £37.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A