THE PRIORY TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating a community centre including offering a wide range of educational courses and providing facilities to various user groups. Raising capital funds to continue with the restoration of the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 03 April 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BISHOP CHARLES IAN GRAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
IAIN ARCHIBALD BROWN | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE JOY YEARDLEY | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK JOSEPH VAUGHAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
GEOFFREY FAIRWEATHER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £640.63k | £691.92k | £456.91k | £376.10k | £212.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £571.36k | £442.99k | £368.68k | £344.03k | £310.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £420.52k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £84.53k | £238.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £556.10k | £453.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £3 | £163 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £220.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £555.81k | £433.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.55k | £9.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 FEBRUARY 2002
Charitable objects
(A) TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST. CATHERINES, LINCOLN ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD (B)(1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LINCOLN BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE (2) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
REASBY MANOR
REASBY
LINCOLN
LN3 5BW
- Phone:
- 07920131513
- Email:
- info@priorylincoln.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window