WINDMILL COMMUNITY TRANSPORT LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Windmill community transport assists the charitable work of organisations and bodies engaged in promoting the relief of the elderly, people with mobility problems and other groups, as in our governing document. this is through assistance with the provision of suitable accessible transport to those groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leeds City
Governance
- 26 February 2002: Standard registration
- WINDMILL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Pallister | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Simmons | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Douglas Graham Fox | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
WAYNE HOYLE | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|||||
ANDREW WALKER | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROGER SHOOTER | Trustee | 15 October 2001 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.90k | £2.29k | £2.23k | £2.23k | £3.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.65k | £3.83k | £5.46k | £16.65k | £33.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 JANUARY 2002 AND 25 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR SUCH OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEEDS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WHO ARE IN NEED OF SUCH A SERVICE BECAUSE OF AGE, SICKNESS, DISABILITY (MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), OR POVERTY OR BECAUSE OF A LACK OF AVAILABILITY OF ADEQUATE AND SAFE PUBLIC PASSENGER SERVICES.
Area of benefit
LEEDS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
WALSHAN COTTAGE
SANDERSON LANE
OULTON
LEEDS
LS26 8HB
- Phone:
- 07813618166
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window