CANCER RESEARCH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cancer Research UK is dedicated to saving lives through research. Our mission is to prevent, control and cure cancer through our ground-breaking research and in the last 40 years our work has helped double survival rates. But there is more work to be done. The only charity fighting over 200 types of cancer, we rely on every pound donated to help get us closer to beating cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£684,207,447
Donations and legacies | £463.54m | |
Charitable activities | £75.71m | |
Other trading activities | £134.23m | |
Investments | £8.27m | |
Other | £2.46m |
Total expenditure:
£692,424,949
Raising funds | £133.32m | |
Charitable activities | £431.90m | |
Other | £127.21m |
£33,374,601 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £28,650 from 3 government contract(s) and £3,579,084 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £260.53m | |
Charitable expenditure | £431.90m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £260.53m | |
Charitable expenditure | £431.90m | |
Retained for future use | £25.16m |
People

4879 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
25200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 139 |
£70k to £80k | 67 |
£80k to £90k | 48 |
£90k to £100k | 17 |
£100k to £110k | 12 |
£110k to £120k | 6 |
£120k to £130k | 5 |
£130k to £140k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 3 |
£150k to £200k | 8 |
£200k to £250k | 4 |
£250k to £300k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 September 1967: Standard registration
- CANCER RESEARCH UNITED KINGDOM (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Dr Reinier Harm Medema | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Philip Evans | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Eve Smaje | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dame Nancy Jane Rothwell | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lord Simon Stevens | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rakshit Kapoor | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hitesh Thakrar | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Professor Doreen Ann Cantrell FRS | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR GERARD IAN EVAN | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR PAMELA RENATE KEARNS PhD FRCPCH | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert James Campbell Easton | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|||||
JOANNE MARY SHAW | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR DAME MOIRA KATHERINE BRIGID WHYTE DBE | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR NICHOLAS CLWYD JONES | Trustee | 02 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alan Chambre | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £656.11m | £582.08m | £668.37m | £718.79m | £684.21m | |
|
Total expenditure | £703.55m | £570.56m | £665.95m | £640.85m | £692.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £317.59k | £164.40k | £1.45m | £2.70k | £28.65k | |
|
Income from government grants | £360.00k | £15.74m | £5.73m | £3.91m | £3.58m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £423.34m | £414.52m | £426.74m | £490.09m | £463.54m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £107.95m | £47.77m | £111.49m | £126.87m | £134.23m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £117.86m | £97.93m | £107.63m | £93.18m | £75.71m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.07m | £4.56m | £5.10m | £6.17m | £8.27m | |
|
Income - Other | £887.00k | £17.30m | £17.41m | £2.49m | £2.46m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £184.44m | £213.56m | £206.00m | £260.93m | £230.63m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £510.60m | £419.45m | £470.84m | £425.01m | £431.90m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £94.78m | £68.62m | £101.88m | £108.83m | £133.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £1.63m | £1.63m | £1.97m | £5.64m | £7.22m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £336.40m | £273.50m | £360.37m | £285.63m | £293.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.47m | £2.30m | £2.15m | £3.23m | £1.91m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £98.17m | £82.49m | £93.22m | £107.00m | £127.21m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £45.77m | £37.64m | £38.11m | £37.87m | £40.63m | |
|
Long-term investments | £454.96m | £425.10m | £487.44m | £501.14m | £496.83m | |
|
Other assets | £307.60m | £361.98m | £326.29m | £348.62m | £355.21m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £117.04m | £46.30m | £122.35m | £77.20m | £75.05m | |
|
Total liabilities | £626.81m | £579.01m | £596.25m | £583.09m | £565.33m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/07/2012 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2020 as amended on 21 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO PROTECT AND PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF ALL FORMS OF CANCER, INCLUDING THE DEVELOPMENT OF FINDINGS OF RESEARCH INTO PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS FOR THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT AND CURE OF CANCER AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT PRIMARY OBJECT, TO PROVIDE INFORMATION AND RAISE PUBLIC UNDERSTANDING OF SUCH MATTERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 12 September 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cancer Research UK
2 Redman Place
LONDON
E20 1JQ
- Phone:
- 020 7242 0200
- Email:
- secretariat@cancer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window