ENSEMBLE CYMRU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ensemble Cymru is a professional orchestral ensemble which brings chamber music informed by Welsh culture, history and heritage to communities and schools across Wales including areas facing socio-economic deprivation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £1,900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 30 January 2002: Standard registration
- 29 October 2024: Funds received from 1129148 THE PATSY WOOD TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMANDA JANE PEMBERTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alun Rhys Prytherch | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jayne Butler | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Roger Brooks | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN BARSBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.96k | £103.15k | £98.71k | £71.47k | £71.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.86k | £76.45k | £105.00k | £90.26k | £68.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.60k | £4.91k | £1.90k | £1.90k | £1.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2001. as amended on 20 May 2019
Charitable objects
ADDYSGU'R CYHOEDD, YN BENNAF OND NID YN UNIG YNG NGHYMRU, I WERTHFAWROGI MWYNHAU A DEALL CELFYDDYD A GWYDDOR CERDDORIAETH A'R CELFYDDYDAU PERFFORMIO. THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN WALES, IN THE APPRECIATION ENJOYMENT AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC AND THE PERFORMING ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ystafell 346
Prif Adeilad y Brifysgol
Ffordd y Coleg
BANGOR
- Phone:
- 01248568888
- Email:
- post@ensemble.cymru
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window