CHIPPING CAMPDEN SURGERY FRIENDS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's main activity is to provide health related equipment and services for the benefit of the local residents of Chipping Campden and the surrounding area, including the patients of the local surgery. This includes the provision of equipment and health related services but not in substitution of anything that should normally be provided by any statutory body or the local surgery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 January 2002: Standard registration
- CAMPDEN SURGERY FRIENDS (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY PRICE | Chair | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
STEFAN DAY | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pritchard | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARGARET LUMSDON | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Mark James Reckitt | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Hon Jane Maureen Therese Glennie | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Vienneta HANCOCK | Trustee | 30 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £754 | £1.10k | £101 | £1.21k | £1.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £714 | £0 | £3.89k | £4.18k | £1.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 April 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 OCTOBER 2001
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, PAIN AND DISTRESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH, AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, PROVIDING OR IMPROVING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF IMPROVEMENT OF MEDICAL AND SURGICAL SUPPLIES, SERVICES, TRAINING AND MATERIALS (INCLUDING ARTICLES FOR USE IN THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE GENERAL COMFORT OF PATIENTS) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BUT ESPECIALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PATIENTS OF CHIPPING CAMPDEN SURGERY. PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT THE PERFORMANCE OF ANY ACT BY THE CHARITY IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OR PROMOTION OF THE OBJECTS SHALL ONLY ENHANCE (AND NOT REPLACE OR BE IN SUBSTITUTION FOR) ANYTHING FOR WHICH PROVISION IS MADE BY STATUTORY AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GLOUCESTERSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE AND WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Evergreens
Station Road
CHIPPING CAMPDEN
Gloucestershire
GL55 6HY
- Phone:
- 01386841386
- Email:
- price.evergreens@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window