Society of the Friends of the Royal Artillery Museum

Charity number: 1091365
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Support to the Collections of the Royal Artillery through grant provision from membership subscriptions and donations and with occasional assistance with volunteer support to the fabric of the Collections and photographing Collection items.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,344
Total expenditure: £5,792

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 March 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF FIREPOWER (Working name)
  • THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF FIREPOWER (Previous name)
  • THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL ARTILLERY COLLECTIONS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Edward Cattermole Trustee 06 January 2021
None on record
Major Rick Hatton Trustee 22 March 2017
None on record
Mr Len Duvall Trustee 13 June 2016
None on record
Colonel PETER BROWNLOW WILLIAMS OBE Trustee 13 June 2016
BOURTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Colonel John David Wilson Trustee 13 June 2016
None on record
PHILIP JOBSON Trustee 06 July 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £4.44k £4.01k £3.31k £3.14k £3.34k
Total expenditure £5.78k £167 £207 £4.52k £5.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 November 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 April 2021 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Beechcroft
Bourton
GILLINGHAM
Dorset
SP8 5BJ
Phone:
01747840220
Website:

No information available