ZOE'S PLACE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of hospice care for children aged 0 to 5 years. This may be extended to age 7 if there is a clinical or social need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£4,024,456
Donations and legacies | £2.66m | |
Charitable activities | £677.58k | |
Other trading activities | £639.36k | |
Investments | £25.28k | |
Other | £24.70k |
Total expenditure:
£5,311,294
Raising funds | £1.42m | |
Charitable activities | £3.89m | |
Other | £0 |
£58,440 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £677,583 from 3 government contract(s) and £677,583 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.42m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.89m |
People

131 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 June 2002: Standard registration
- 13 October 2020: Funds received from 1175307 NUNEATON COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE
- 21 March 2023: Funds received from 1185211 LAYLAS LEGACY UK
- 24 April 2024: Funds received from 1025953 CHILDREN'S CENTRE SUPPORT GROUP
- 04 February 2025: Funds received from 1014757 COVENTRY CHILDRENS CONTACT CENTRE
- 15 May 2025: Funds received from 1035971 REDCAR SUNNY DAYS PLAYGROUP
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alan Schofield | Chair | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lois Zapasnik | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Win Tin | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER GREENALL | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOAN STAINSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rev PETER DAMIEN MCGUIRE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.79m | £3.86m | £4.09m | £4.30m | £4.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.92m | £2.78m | £3.33m | £4.42m | £5.31m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £230.80k | £256.03k | £372.29k | £535.13k | £677.58k | |
|
Income from government grants | £719.23k | £994.40k | £751.27k | £535.13k | £677.58k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.09m | £3.27m | £3.24m | £3.26m | £2.66m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £382.03k | £207.95k | £445.61k | £484.04k | £639.36k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £256.03k | £373.15k | £397.71k | £535.13k | £677.58k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.46k | £3.47k | £3.69k | £11.71k | £25.28k | |
|
Income - Other | £57.34k | £6.73k | £4.17k | £6.23k | £24.70k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £94.62k | £566.08k | £735.34k | £848.39k | £104.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.13m | £2.07m | £2.43m | £3.28m | £3.89m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £793.99k | £709.17k | £904.01k | £1.14m | £1.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £534.19k | £318.47k | £0 | £63.89k | £183.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.22m | £1.11m | £1.12m | £1.17m | £1.17m | |
|
Long-term investments | £237.33k | £296.66k | £497.00k | £520.19k | £578.63k | |
|
Other assets | £2.22m | £2.66m | £3.35m | £4.14m | £2.73m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £967.84k | £214.84k | £359.10k | £1.33m | £1.20m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MAY 2002 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 29 SEPTEMBER 2008 AND 12 DECEMBER 2008 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 06 DEC 2016 as amended on 18 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
the relief of children specifically but not exclusively aged 0 ? 5 years suffering from terminal or life limiting illnesses and their families by the establishment and maintaining of hospices throughout the United Kingdom to be known as Zoe's places. This care and support may be extended to children up to the age of 8 where there is a clinical or family need
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ZOE'S PLACE TRUST
15 DORMER PLACE
LEAMINGTON SPA
CV32 5AA
- Phone:
- 01926889633
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window