DOVER RETAIL CRIME OPERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of crime prevention and education measures. The protection of people and property. The prevention of criminal acts. Encouragement of greater public participation in the prevention of crime. Provision of education and practical assistance to the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 28 May 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH CIANTAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mark Peter STANNARD | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey HUBBARD | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen DRY | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Allen Russell | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nathan SUTTON | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Maslak | Trustee | 12 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Yates | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP EVERARD SMYE-RUMSBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN MICHAEL ELCOCKS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.42k | £26.83k | £26.77k | £32.36k | £24.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.23k | £22.73k | £21.68k | £21.60k | £24.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.42k | £3.30k | £720 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 19 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 3 OCTOBER, 2001.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF CRIME PREVENTION/EDUCATION MEASURES WITHIN THE DESIGNATED AREA OF DOVER IN CONJUNCTION WITH THE POLICE, DOVER TOWN CENTRE MANAGEMENT, OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES, AND THE PROTECTION OF PEOPLE AND PROPERTY FROM AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIMINAL ACTS BY 1 THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND 2 THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, INFORMATION AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
DOVER, KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Dover Town Council
Maison Dieu House
Biggin Street
DOVER
Kent
CT16 1DW
- Phone:
- 07967077493
- Email:
- dpac.org.uk@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window