Girlguiding Barnard Castle Division

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular meetings and events for Rainbows, Brownies, Guides & Rangers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 30 August 2002: Standard registration
- BARNARD CASTLE DISTRICT OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES ROWLANDSON | Trustee | 13 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAIN LAMONT BROWN | Trustee | 04 February 2016 |
|
|||||
MRS M ASHBURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PATRICIA ANN CHILD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.24k | £1.03k | £4.00k | £16.35k | £6.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.53k | £4.71k | £4.20k | £18.95k | £7.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | £11.37k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
EDUCATING GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN TO HELP THEM DEVELOP EMOTIONALLY, MENTALLY, PHYSICALLY AND SPIRITUALLY SO THAT THEY CAN MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THEIR COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER WORLD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE BARNARD CASTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barnard Castle Girlguiding HQ
Birch Road
BARNARD CASTLE
County Durham
DL12 8JR
- Phone:
- 07747 868975
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window