THE ARABESQUE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in the knowledge and appreciation of the arts and music and in particular but not exclusively the music of blind composers and blind pipe organists born in the UK through the provision of grants and in such a manner as the trustees shall in their absolute ciscretion determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN RENNERT | Chair | 01 August 2001 |
|
|||||||
Giles Stockton | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Richard William Moore | Trustee | 30 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||
BENJAMIN JOHN COSTELLO | Trustee | 20 April 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.50k | £16.39k | £20.48k | £20.77k | £19.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.42k | £6.37k | £24.53k | £17.54k | £14.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 25 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 1 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 19 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AND MUSIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE MUSIC OF BLIND COMPOSERS AND BLIND PIPE ORGANISTS BORN IN THE UK THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
102 Vicars Moor Lane
LONDON
N21 1BN
- Phone:
- 07931 750216
- Email:
- info@arabesque-trust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window