Financial history THE SAINT MARY'S CHURCH, BRAUGHING RESTORATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1092636
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £7.95k £5.57k £5.51k £6.63k £16.85k
Total expenditure £20.28k £0 £525 £705 £20.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.60k