STEPS ROMANIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work with partner charities in Romania to renovate and extend existing buildings or construct new buildings. The partner charity then uses the buildings to provide shelter, training, education and basic health care to disadvantaged children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Romania
Governance
- 28 June 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEWART CHAPMAN | Chair | 17 July 2012 |
|
|||||
Hannah Chapman | Trustee | 22 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
GLYNIS COOPER | Trustee | 02 March 2012 |
|
|||||
Susan Mary Dean | Trustee | 03 August 2011 |
|
|||||
MR MIKE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VIVIENNE MARGARET ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROY DUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOF ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
Rev ASHLEY COOPER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.48k | £11.33k | £5.68k | £4.02k | £2.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.72k | £14.57k | £7.95k | £3.37k | £2.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 195 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 561 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 561 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 926 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 926 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1291 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1291 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1656 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1656 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/03/2002 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/2006 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 18/02/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SHELTER, BASIC HYGIENE AND MEDICAL CARE, EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN IN ROMANIA THE CHARITY WILL WORK WITH THE APPROPRIATE AUTHORITIES AND ORGANIZATIONS IN DEVELOPING AND MANAGING ITS PROJECTS
Area of benefit
ROMANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 SCRIMSHAW DRIVE
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST6 7PX
- Phone:
- 01782823774
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window