Financial history TRELOAR TRUST

Charity Number: 1092857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £23.77m £25.73m £25.97m £27.66m £30.63m
Total expenditure £24.17m £26.17m £26.01m £28.53m £31.35m
Income from government contracts £20.85m £20.63m £20.98m £23.65m £25.56m
Income from government grants £310.00k £2.59m £2.15m £295.65k £551.65k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.60m £1.22m £1.47m £1.24m £1.57m
Income - Other trading activities £598.00k £635.51k £595.79k £778.23k £961.00k
Income - Charitable activities £21.49m £23.77m £23.64m £25.39m £27.89m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £93.00k £102.40k £266.79k £249.08k £207.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £193.00k £261.45k £76.84k £174.78k £272.34k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.23m £25.56m £25.33m £27.72m £30.47m
Expenditure - Raising funds £945.00k £609.44k £683.50k £809.09k £885.00k
Expenditure - Governance £236.00k £231.16k £283.05k £248.85k £1.34m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £78.00k £70.65k £72.96k £76.14k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0