Financial history HERBERT DAY TRUST

Charity number: 1096463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.61k £3.20k £3.39k £2.86k £4.09k
Total expenditure £138 £8.14k £5.17k £5.12k £114
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A