Financial history JENNYRUTH WORKSHOPS LTD

Charity number: 1093957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £237.02k £278.99k £292.67k £493.28k £543.35k
Total expenditure £238.60k £270.96k £334.02k £340.11k £476.44k
Income from government contracts £88.13k £84.99k £106.33k £135.80k £210.50k
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £17.26k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £53.31k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £448.84k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.23k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £21.70k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £473.19k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.12k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £130