Financial history THE PROCLAMATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1094952
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024 31/08/2024
Total gross income £695.28k £1.35m £897.88k £1.45m £69.27k
Total expenditure £846.26k £3.05m £1.53m £6.15m £191.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £6.95k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £142.95k £430.47k £150.36k £619.42k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £16.95k £57.70k £111.85k £92.62k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £469.89k £855.11k £618.75k £734.69k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £53.05k £2.81k £16.93k £8.01k N/A
Income - Other £12.44k £6.95k £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £263.00k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £468.18k £3.05m £1.53m £6.15m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £2.50k £2.40k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £9.65k £12.26k £20.90k £51.02k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £378.08k £0 £0 £0 N/A