Financial history COMET CHARITIES LTD

Charity Number: 1097871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £2.39m £2.30m £2.51m £2.36m £2.39m
Total expenditure £2.38m £2.20m £2.74m £2.53m £2.33m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.39m £2.30m £2.51m £2.36m £2.39m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £100 £47 £570 £35 £17
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.34m £2.20m £2.72m £2.49m £2.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.25k £3.06k £16.44k £41.62k £54.45k
Expenditure - Governance £11.10k £6.36k £11.09k £11.45k £8.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.20m £2.10m £2.60m £2.31m £2.16m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0