THE SCORPION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustee shall hold the capital and income of the Trust Fund upon trust to apply income and, as far as may be necessary, capital for or towards such charitable purposes and to make donations to such charitable bodies or institutions at such times and in such manner as the Trustees may, in their absolute discretion, think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 October 2002: Standard registration
- 13 November 2018: Funds received from 287483 THE RAWLINGS CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rathbones Trust Company Limited | Trustee | 23 August 2002 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.58k | £53.88k | £1.58m | £679.15k | £127.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.15k | £179.64k | £119.26k | £97.84k | £315.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.50m | £560.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £78.97k | £119.15k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £119.26k | £83.36k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | £14.48k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £2.98k | £5.86k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £103.00k | £77.50k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £14.48k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 05 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 18 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 21 September 2022 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 14 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD AUGUST 2002
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND AND MAY ALSO TRANSFER PAY OR APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE AND UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rathbones Trust Company Limited
30 Gresham Street
LONDON
EC2V 7QN
- Phone:
- 0207 399 0444
- Email:
- rtccharities@rathbones.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window