THE PERRY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small grants to meet special needs and to support education, training and the arts in the West Midlands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Herefordshire
- Shropshire
- Warwickshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 November 2002: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIR MICHAEL PERRY GBE | Chair |
|
||||||||
LADY JOAN MARY PERRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
WILLIAM BRIAN STALLARD | Trustee |
|
||||||||
CAROLYN CLARE EYTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50k | £4.67k | £24.60k | £59.65k | £17.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.01k | £23.69k | £30.50k | £33.91k | £53.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE WEST MIDLANDS 2. TO PROVIDE RELIEF OR SUPPORT FOR PERSONS RESIDING AT OR RECEIVING CARE OR TREATMENT IN ANY HOSPICE OR HOME FOR THOSE WHO ARE HANDICAPPED OR TERMINALLY ILL OR ELDERLY OR INFORM OR ON THEIR DISCHARGE WHO ARE SICK. CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE 3. TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN ATTENDING A SCHOOL OF ANY DENOMINATION IN THE WEST MIDLANDS 4. TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATION ESTABLISHMENT APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES TO PERSONS UNDER TWENTY-FIVE YEARS OF AGE WHO, OR WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS, ARE RESIDENT IN THE WEST MIDLANDS OR WHO ARE ATTENDING OR WHO HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN THREE YEARS ATTENDED AN EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AND WHO ARE IN NEED OR FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO SUCH PERSONS ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO PREPARE THEM FOR OR ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A TRADE PROFESSION OR SERVICE AND TO AWARD TO SUCH PERSONS GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD IN FURTHERANCE OF THEIR EDUCATION AND OTHERWISE TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS 5. TO EDUCATE AND ASSIST YOUNG PERSONS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED 6. TO SUPPORT THE ARTS IN THE WEST MIDLANDS, IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING GRANTS TO INSTITUTIONS AND BY PROMOTING PUBLIC EXHIBITIONS , LECTURES, CONCERTS, RECITALS AND OTHER EVENTS
Area of benefit
PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIDGES STONE MILL
BRIDGES STONE
ALFRICK
WORCESTER
WR6 5HR
- Phone:
- 01886833290
- Email:
- Perrytrust@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window