LINCOLN COLLEGE OXFORD

Charity Number: 1139261
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal focus of the College's activities is on its academic work: that is, high quality research and the education of new generations of students in a range of subject areas. The College provides facilities for study, in the form of teaching and seminar rooms, lecture theatres, a Library and co-operative access to the laboratory and other facilities provided by Oxford University.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 2010: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • LINCOLN COLLEGE (Working name)
  • THE COLLEGE OF THE BLESSED MARY AND ALL SAINTS IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD (Working name)
  • THE WARDEN OR RECTOR AND SCHOLARS OF THE COLLEGE OF THE BLESSED MARY AND ALL SAINTS, LINCOLN, IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

31 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR HENRY RUXTON WOUDHUYSEN Chair 12 December 2013
None on record
Dr PETER SARKIES Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHE SCHMITT-MAASS Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Dr JONG PHIL PARK Trustee 02 September 2020
None on record
Dr JOSHUA BENNET Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Dr LYDIA MATTHEWS Trustee 06 August 2020
None on record
Dr KIMBERELY PALLADINO Trustee 01 July 2020
None on record
Dr ANDREAS TELEVANTOS Trustee 02 September 2019
None on record
Dr JODY LAPORTE Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Dr ALEXANDER PRESCOTT-COUCH Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Dr LUCY WOODING Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
PROFESSOR PEDRO CARVALHO Trustee 01 August 2016
None on record
ALEX DOMINIC SPAIN Trustee 14 April 2016
None on record
Dr PAUL NICHOLAS STAVRINOU Trustee 01 April 2016
None on record
Dr Aleksei Parakhonyak Trustee 01 August 2015
None on record
Dr DANIELA OMLOR Trustee 01 October 2014
THE MODERN HUMANITIES RESEARCH ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
PROFESSOR MATTHEW FREEMAN Trustee 18 December 2013
EDWARD PENLEY ABRAHAM RESEARCH FUND
Received: On time
JOHN BURDON-SANDERSON PATHOLOGY TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE GUY NEWTON RESEARCH FUND
Received: On time
PROFESSOR STEFAN ENCHELMAIER Trustee 12 December 2013
LINCOLN COLLEGE VACATION PROJECT
Received: On time
SUSAN ROSEMARY HARRISON Trustee 12 December 2013
None on record
Dr TIMOTHY MICHAEL Trustee 12 December 2013
None on record
Dr QIAN WANG Trustee 12 December 2013
None on record
Dr DOMINIC JOSEPH ROBERT VELLA Trustee 21 March 2012
None on record
Dr PETER MCCULLOUGH Trustee
None on record
Dr DAVID VAUX Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID ANTHONY HILLS Trustee
None on record
Dr PEREGRINE LEE GAUCI Trustee
None on record
Dr MARIA STAMATOPOULOU Trustee
None on record
Dr MICHAEL WILLIS Trustee
None on record
Dr NIGEL EMPTAGE Trustee
LINCOLN COLLEGE VACATION PROJECT
Received: On time
Dr RADU COLDEA Trustee
None on record
Dr EDWARD NYE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £15.07m £15.40m £22.06m £16.32m £14.74m
Total expenditure £12.97m £11.49m £13.44m £15.53m £16.49m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £6.17m £7.69m £14.35m £7.01m £3.85m
Income - Other trading activities £246.00k £111.00k £71.00k £233.00k £310.00k
Income - Charitable activities £5.71m £4.86m £5.15m £6.25m £7.10m
Income - Endowments £1.79m £2.95m £8.72m £3.59m £1.23m
Income - Investment £2.94m £2.44m £2.01m £2.79m £2.68m
Income - Other £0 £309.00k £481.00k £46.00k £805.00k
Income - Legacies £4.38m £4.74m £943.45k £3.42m £2.62m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.18m £9.56m £10.27m £13.43m £13.70m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.55m £1.89m £3.09m £1.87m £2.49m
Expenditure - Governance £412.00k £428.00k £1.96m £419.00k £437.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £937.00k £847.00k £2.59m £876.00k £1.79m
Expenditure - Other £237.00k £42.00k £76.00k £225.00k £296.00k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Own use assets £30.92m £36.95m £40.37m £39.49m £39.61m
Long-term investments £140.75m £139.11m £168.43m £175.62m £172.78m
Other assets £24.49m £19.56m £11.00m £10.30m £6.03m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.64m -£1.77m -£1.35m -£2.27m -£1.84m
Total liabilities £32.90m £32.44m £32.75m £32.08m £27.24m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 13 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 13 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 30 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 30 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 11 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 11 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 12 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 11 June 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 June 2020 11 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LINCOLN COLLEGE
TURL STREET
OXFORD
OX1 3DR
Phone:
01865279800
Email:
No information available