Trustees BRIGHTON AND HOVE CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1094620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Meager Chair 19 November 2015
None on record
Michael Wang Trustee 09 January 2025
None on record
Gavin Berman Trustee 09 January 2025
None on record
Muhammod Towhid Ahmed Trustee 09 January 2025
None on record
Fraser Woodward Trustee 21 March 2024
SALTDEAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MINDOUT LGB&T MENTAL HEALTH PROJECT
Received: On time
Kath Stipala Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
Simon Blakeney Trustee 23 February 2023
None on record
Mark Green Trustee 09 June 2020
None on record
MARK CLARK Trustee 06 December 2019
ACTION FOR DEAFNESS
Received: On time
George Longfoot Trustee 20 November 2014
None on record
FRANCES HARRISON Trustee 03 January 2013
None on record