Financial history LOWER MOLE COUNTRYSIDE TRUST

Charity number: 1095771
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £9.86k £6.47k £7.83k £5.88k £7.57k
Total expenditure £6.92k £4.27k £11.93k £9.39k £7.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A