Trustees LOWER MOLE COUNTRYSIDE TRUST
Charity number: 1095771

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ernest Rodney Shaw | Chair | 03 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Martin David Edward Owen | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Cocker | Trustee | 14 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Fielding | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Jerome Oven | Trustee | 27 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE CLAYTON | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|||||
ALAN DOUGLAS HERBERT SHERREN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.