Financial history SWARTHMORE EDUCATION CENTRE

Charity Number: 1094451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.56m £1.50m £1.61m £1.76m £1.94m
Total expenditure £1.55m £1.51m £1.71m £1.83m £1.93m
Income from government contracts £1.15m £1.24m £1.33m £1.41m £1.53m
Income from government grants £107.30k £126.12k £1.47k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £111.27k £202.75k £23.81k £24.36k £104.73k
Income - Other trading activities £62.48k £4.34k £80.33k £119.92k £117.54k
Income - Charitable activities £1.38m £1.28m £1.50m £1.60m £1.71m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £9.03k £11.23k £3.13k £13.54k £2.93k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.46m £1.47m £1.63m £1.74m £1.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £91.26k £46.95k £74.44k £87.18k £88.92k
Expenditure - Governance £49.78k £55.71k £69.67k £70.86k £80.91k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0