Financial history SPURGEONS COLLEGE

Charity number: 1096721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.32m £1.87m £1.19m £1.24m £1.11m
Total expenditure £1.92m £2.29m £2.30m £3.30m £3.35m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £61.58k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £338.57k £774.06k £184.36k £276.99k £97.09k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £138.08k £0
Income - Charitable activities £890.49k £973.93k £886.45k £802.07k £819.44k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.69k £16.56k £16.58k £24.64k £55.64k
Income - Other £76.61k £109.07k £104.66k £0 £139.88k
Income - Legacies £83.94k £574.52k £32.41k £101.14k £20.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.89m £2.27m £2.27m £3.23m £3.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £28.05k £23.65k £24.68k £66.51k £88.15k
Expenditure - Governance £16.49k £17.24k £37.87k £36.72k £37.58k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £7.09k £7.17k £7.60k £7.03k £7.18k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0