Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF NORTHAMPTON WEST CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1094926
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £63 £30 £3.28k £1.85k £868
Total expenditure £0 £0 £175 £4.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A