COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1095050
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our activities include: - Strengthening EU legislation and enforcement on animal welfare. - Persuading food companies to sell higher welfare products across their entire product ranges. - Enabling consumers to make higher welfare food choices. - Persuading intergovernmental agencies to adopt higher welfare policies. - Supporting producers who champion higher welfare practices.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Belgium
  • China
  • Czech Republic
  • France
  • Ireland
  • Italy
  • Netherlands
  • Poland
  • South Africa
  • Spain
  • Ukraine
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 December 2002: Standard registration
  • 22 July 2020: Funds received from 327829 THE JUNE STEVENS FOUNDATION
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • CIWF TRUST (Working name)
  • COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING (Previous name)
  • COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING TRUST (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
VALERIE JAMES Chair 27 July 2006
FARM LIVESTOCK TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING (ATHENE) TRUST
Received: On time
Varda Mehrotra Trustee 13 March 2025
None on record
MARK WATTS Trustee 06 December 2024
None on record
Ria Rehberg Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Professor Joy Carter Trustee 12 March 2021
ST ETHELBURGA'S CENTRE FOR RECONCILIATION AND PEACE
Received: On time
A ROCHA UK
Received: On time
Joyce Mary D'Silva Trustee 10 November 2017
None on record
SIR DAVID CHRISTOPHER ANDREW MADDEN Trustee 23 July 2010
None on record
SARAH PETRINI Trustee 31 March 2005
FARM LIVESTOCK TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING (ATHENE) TRUST
Received: On time
MR TEDDY BOURNE Trustee 14 November 2002
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.57m £12.43m £14.03m £13.17m £11.91m
Total expenditure £11.27m £10.25m £11.63m £14.75m £16.26m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £129.92k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £11.29m £12.18m £13.78m £12.85m £11.55m
Income - Other trading activities £133.82k £152.45k £154.25k £143.95k £186.65k
Income - Charitable activities £8.21k £5.35k £1.72k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £137.42k £85.74k £82.44k £161.65k £177.29k
Income - Other £7.46k £7.46k £7.46k £12.46k £0
Income - Legacies £2.78m £4.20m £3.57m £3.38m £2.51m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.00m £7.47m £8.45m £11.28m £12.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.27m £2.78m £3.18m £3.47m £4.06m
Expenditure - Governance £70.86k £110.77k £169.31k £375.73k £242.07k
Expenditure - Grants institution £116.01k £158.31k £200.12k £176.42k £30.20k
Expenditure - Investment management £43.35k £39.55k £34.63k £35.10k £33.49k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £5.48k £0 £0 £0 £23.53k
Long-term investments £5.78m £4.77m £6.79m £6.36m £3.85m
Other assets £2.79m £6.45m £7.14m £5.96m £4.00m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £617.79k £890.45k £1.22m £1.49m £1.48m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 28 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 28 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 02 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COMPASSION IN WORLD FARMING
RIVER COURT
MILL LANE
GODALMING
GU7 1EZ
Phone:
01483521953
Website:

ciwf.org.uk