THE KIDERMINSTER WAR MEMORIALS CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for the restoration of the Town's War Memorials.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 24 January 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENNETH JOHN STOKES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JAMES SHELLIE | Trustee |
|
||||||
LARRY BILLINGSLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILLIP THURSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GAY ADAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUTH BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONALD GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COUNCILLOR HELEN DYKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.78k | £2.55k | £1.71k | £2.55k | £1.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.35k | £547 | £815 | £2.74k | £3.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN REPAIR RESTORE PRESERVE IMPROVE BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF ANY PUBLIC WAR MEMORIAL PRESENTLY ERECTED OR WHICH MAY HEREAFTER BE ERECTED OR CONSTRUCTED WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
IN THE TOWN OF KIDDERMINSTER IN THE COUNTY OF WORCESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 SION AVENUE
KIDDERMINSTER
DY10 2YL
- Phone:
- 01562751619
- Email:
- k.stokes95@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window