THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND

Charity Number: 1095904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Torch Trust for the Blind is an established Christian mission that aims to overcome sight loss as a barrier to finding a personal faith in Christ and living a fulfilled Christian life. It provides Christian literature (in braille, giant print and audio media), fellowship and personal support to visually impaired people in the UK and around the world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 February 2003: Standard registration
  • 06 August 2024: Funds received from 1049001 AMMANFORD TALKING NEWSPAPERS
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TORCH FAMILY (Working name)
  • TORCH FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
  • TORCH TRUST,TORCH (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANTHONY BROWN Chair 16 July 2014
ARETE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTHAM COMMUNITY CHURCH
Received: On time
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
Philip Rice Trustee 05 February 2025
DESBOROUGH MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST
Received: On time
ST GILES’ CHURCH, DESBOROUGH
Received: On time
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
Edith Townsend Trustee 07 November 2024
FLECKNEY BAPTIST PRE-SCHOOL
Received: On time
Brian William Anderson Trustee 04 October 2023
None on record
Sheila Armstrong Trustee 09 February 2023
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
Ifeolu Omoniyi Akintunde Trustee 04 November 2021
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time
ANNIE MAWSON'S SUNBEAMS MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
MARILYN BAKER Trustee
THE TORCH TRUST FOR THE BLIND
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £846.11k £667.23k £644.35k £698.92k £832.52k
Total expenditure £988.93k £895.41k £671.16k £692.00k £756.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £70.38k £10.92k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £683.04k £518.46k £573.84k £602.58k £707.79k
Income - Other trading activities £82.41k £0 £0 £0 £36.57k
Income - Charitable activities £16.40k £52.97k £14.05k £40.10k £54.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £38.47k £25.43k £34.04k £56.24k £33.69k
Income - Other £25.77k £70.38k £22.42k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £292.30k £174.29k £180.30k £235.69k £382.02k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £960.95k £875.53k £645.09k £676.06k £748.94k
Expenditure - Raising funds £21.17k £15.15k £21.10k £15.94k £7.62k
Expenditure - Governance £5.65k £4.73k £1.66k £6.91k £10.16k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £36.84k
Expenditure - Investment management £1.17k £90 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £6.81k £4.73k £4.97k £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £2.52m £1.14m £1.13m £1.12m £1.10m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £1.05m £982.00k £995.00k
Other assets £492.00k £1.59m £172.41k £201.82k £271.00k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £358.26k £390.50k £29.43k £45.09k £20.87k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 24 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 01 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 01 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 01 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 01 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 09 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 09 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 16 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TORCH HOUSE
TORCH WAY
NORTHAMPTON ROAD
MARKET HARBOROUGH
LEICS
LE16 9HL
Phone:
01858438260