Financial history SURREY CAMPAIGN TO PROTECT RURAL ENGLAND LIMITED

Charity number: 1106245
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £84.55k £50.96k £32.82k £157.85k £39.31k
Total expenditure £58.68k £67.72k £34.44k £25.49k £35.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A