Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF YARDLEY GRANGE NURSING HOME

Charity number: 1098773
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 01 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 18 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 13 November 2023 197 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 16 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required