Financial history THE LATE MR LEONARD MARCHANT MINTY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1097493
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.69k £3.04k £5.17k £3.20k £3.94k
Total expenditure £8.84k £7.32k £10.91k £7.60k £8.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A