Financial history THE DR ELLEN SPEERS EMSLIE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1097253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.72k £1.78k £3.12k £2.00k £2.45k
Total expenditure £5.43k £5.61k £3.79k £2.04k £2.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A