Financial history NUFFIELD COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD

Charity number: 1137506
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £12.08m £11.89m £46.50m £13.83m £14.49m
Total expenditure £12.16m £12.81m £49.26m £16.86m £11.85m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £50.00k £51.00k £50.00k £23.00k £45.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £270.00k £357.00k £405.00k £272.00k £1.21m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £32.37m £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.81m £1.39m £1.84m £2.04m £2.22m
Income - Endowments £268.00k £354.00k £392.00k £270.00k £1.21m
Income - Investment £10.09m £10.45m £12.27m £11.79m £12.27m
Income - Other £176.00k £51.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.10m £9.26m £13.33m £12.57m £7.90m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.05m £3.55m £35.72m £4.29m £3.95m
Expenditure - Governance £19.00k £19.00k £23.00k £28.00k £37.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.83m £3.31m £3.07m £4.00m £3.70m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £208.00k £0 £0