Financial history BOURNEMOUTH AND DISTRICT ASSOCIATION OF ORGANISTS

Charity Number: 1098369
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £800 £1.67k £1.44k £2.02k £1.04k
Total expenditure £530 £1.27k £1.86k £2.51k £651
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A