Financial history TONBRIDGE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1097977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £31.40m £33.78m £50.08m £43.42m £45.73m
Total expenditure £31.20m £29.83m £37.77m £41.41m £43.76m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £992.98k £1.14m £21.00k £3.00k £8.20k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.10m £4.08m £11.20m £2.59m £932.28k
Income - Other trading activities £2.22m £872.36k £2.39m £2.89m £3.04m
Income - Charitable activities £25.96m £28.74m £36.40m £37.71m £41.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £127.43k £90.04k £81.65k £234.15k £487.37k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £49.00k £115.14k £52.40k £132.50k £18.50k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £29.07m £28.67m £36.23m £39.64m £41.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.13m £1.16m £1.53m £1.77m £2.27m
Expenditure - Governance £249.75k £269.73k £341.15k £357.80k £519.87k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £28.64k £29.26k £30.40k £32.71k £35.69k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0