Accounts and annual returns CHOFETZ CHAIM TRUST FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1098839
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 14 May 2025 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 14 May 2025 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 January 2025 275 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 January 2025 275 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 12 July 2023 73 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 12 July 2023 73 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 28 July 2022 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 28 July 2022 89 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 05 July 2021 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 05 July 2021 66 days late Download Open in new window