Financial history THE BRADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1098592
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £0 £16.02k £9.22k £8.99k £14.77k
Total expenditure £11.86k £15.78k £12.84k £8.73k £40.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A