Trustees FRIENDS OF MELBOURNE PARISH CHURCH
Charity number: 1104024

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon James Hughes | Chair | 10 September 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Glenn Crocker | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Alan Leslie Winfield | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||||||
Stephen Jeremy Webster | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Clive Robert Avery | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Judith Rosemary Baron | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Philip Dobby | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Rosamund Mary Lott | Trustee | 07 March 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Sarah Kington | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
WILLIAM WALTER RALEIGH KERR | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|||||||||
MATTHEW JAMES CHARLES NEEDHAM | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|||||||||
MR B S DOLLAMORE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
PROFESSOR JANET SPENCER PHD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
GRISELDA MARY KERR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
ROGER ANTHONY KINGTON FRICS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.