Financial history THE RHEMA MISSION

Charity Number: 1099434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £33.65k £32.31k £36.32k £35.70k £38.42k
Total expenditure £36.58k £33.81k £38.09k £42.47k £43.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A