VINEYARD CHURCHES UK AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith including missionary activities in the United Kingdom and overseas, including, but not limited to, the planting of new churches. This is achieved by planting new churches to provide public Christian worship, propogate Christian beliefs to bring hope and reason to those in need, spread ethical values to society as a whole, and contribute to social action
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,709,941
Donations and legacies | £1.80m | |
Charitable activities | £865.31k | |
Other trading activities | £9.57k | |
Investments | £14.74k | |
Other | £23.11k |
Total expenditure:
£2,334,539
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.33m | |
Other | £0 |
£14,737 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.33m | |
Retained for future use | £375.40k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.33m | |
Retained for future use | £390.14k |
People

25 Employee(s)
6 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 September 2003: Standard registration
- 01 November 2022: Funds received from 1175242 THE ISLAND VINEYARD CHURCH
- 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1155031 MERTON VINEYARD CHURCH
- 10 July 2023: Funds received from 1155031 MERTON VINEYARD CHURCH
- 10 November 2023: Funds received from 1178680 HERALD VINEYARD LIVERPOOL
- 02 February 2024: Funds received from 1189101 VINEYARD LINCOLN
- 04 July 2024: Funds received from 1063994 VINEYARD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP OF POOLE
- VCUK (Working name)
- VINEYARD (Working name)
- VINEYARD CHURCHES UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Nicholas John Harding | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|||||||
Joanna May Louise Frost | Trustee | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Audrenneive Alareen Farrell | Trustee | 10 June 2023 |
|
|||||||
CLIFFORD JOHN WRIGHT | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT ADAM BYK | Trustee | 28 January 2017 |
|
|
||||||
CLIVE SILLITO | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.67m | £1.32m | £1.45m | £1.94m | £2.71m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33m | £1.39m | £1.54m | £2.03m | £2.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.36m | £1.06m | £0 | £0 | £1.80m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £14.07k | £12.54k | £6.09k | £4.26k | £9.57k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £281.46k | £238.77k | £1.44m | £1.92m | £865.31k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £6.27k | £5.39k | £2.15k | £2.33k | £14.74k | |
|
Income - Other | £8.06k | £3.97k | £1.30k | £5.19k | £23.11k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £5.33k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £10.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.33m | £1.39m | £1.54m | £2.03m | £2.33m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £50 | £0 | £50 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £30.43k | £42.51k | £69.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £5.13k | £5.49k | £7.03k | £14.24k | £19.89k | |
|
Long-term investments | £252.59k | £254.76k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.09m | £922.77k | £1.18m | £1.05m | £1.46m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £220.03k | £124.91k | £219.05k | £192.88k | £237.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2003, AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATES OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 5 JAN 2005, 10 MARCH 2009 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 DEC 2009 as amended on 14 Feb 2020 as amended on 25 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS The objects of the Charity are: 2.1. The advancement of the Christian Faith including missionary activities in the United Kingdom and Overseas in particular (but without limitation) by: 2.1.1. Planting new Churches and organisations and congregations and building and maintaining an association of Vineyard Churches, being an organisation of churches based upon mutual agreements as to vision, mission and purpose voluntarily entered into by such churches, whilst committed to and modelled on the historic Vineyard convictions, values, priorities, practices and leadership standards; 2.1.2. Supporting and strengthening pastors of affiliated churches by providing pastoral care, relationship resources for ministry and a means of bringing biblical discipline, if needed; 2.1.3. Supporting and strengthening affiliated churches by providing general counsel, training materials and potential new or additional pastoral leadership; 2.1.4. Assisting affiliated churches in achieving their mission by providing assistance in defining, strategizing and implementing their mission, and by designing missions, strategies and outreaches in which they may join; 2.1.5. Planting and nurturing new churches which are committed to and model the Vineyard convictions, values, priorities, practices and leadership standards; 2.1.6. Bringing renewal to the larger Christian Church around the world, both through direct ministry and by example. 2.1.7. Providing relief for the poor and needy. 2.1.8. Documenting, recording and distributing by way of printed, audio, video, digital and electronic media, Christian Worship music written and composed primarily, but not exclusively, within affiliated churches of the Charity.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE UNITED KINGDOM (INCLUDING SCOTLAND, IRELAND AND CHANNEL ISLANDS) AND MISSIONARY SUPPORT ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Vineyard Churches UK & Ireland
Unit 8
K3 Business Park
200 Clough Road
HULL
HU5 1SW
- Phone:
- 01482462690
- Email:
- finance.legal@vcuki.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window